CA AB571 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-12 - In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 30 in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend and repeal Sections 10003 and 10202 of the Elections Code, and to amend Section 85301 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 85305, 85306, 85307, 85315, 85316, 85317, and 85318 of, and to add Section 85702.5 to, the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Political Reform Act of 1974: contribution limits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 571 Mullin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-12SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2019-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 13. Page 2116.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16).
2019-05-16AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-04-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-03-14AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2019-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code10003Repealed CodeCitation Text
Elections Code10202Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code85301Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code85305Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code85306New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code85307New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code85315New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code85316New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code85317New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code85318New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback