CA AB57 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 691, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 422.87 and 13519.6 of the Penal Code, relating to law enforcement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law enforcement: hate crimes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 57 Gabriel Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Special Consent AB57 Gabriel et al. By Min (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 57 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 691, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.).
2021-09-08AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-09-08SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.).
2021-09-03SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-07-15SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-06-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1720.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-06-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.)
2021-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-04-14AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-25AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-03-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 23).
2021-03-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-02-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2021-02-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2020-12-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code13519.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code422.87Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback