CA AB569 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2810.7 to the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Discrimination: reproductive health.
Sponsors
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Laura Friedman [D] |
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Assembly - AB 569 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB569 Gonzalez Fletcher By Atkins (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 569 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 17 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB569 Gonzalez Fletcher By Atkins (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 569 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 17 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Stricken from file. | |
2018-01-03 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-10-15 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2017-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 20. Page 3369.). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.) |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2768.). |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 11). |
2017-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 17. Page 1909.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26). |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 2810.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |