CA AB566 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 926.2 of, and to add Section 12962.5 to, the Insurance Code, and to add and repeal Sections 11209.8, 17053.58, and 23658 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2018-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2017-05-26AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-26AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 24).
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2017-03-30AssemblyMeasure version as amended on March 23 corrected.
2017-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on INS.
2017-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-23AssemblyReferred to Coms. on INS. and REV. & TAX.
2017-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2017-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback