CA AB562 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 1.7 (commencing with Section 950) to Division 2 of, and to repeal Section 953 of, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 6276.30 of the Government Code, relating to mental health services, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Frontline COVID-19 Provider Mental Health Resiliency Act of 2021: health care providers: mental health services.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Heath Flora [R] | Asm. Phillip Chen [R] | Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 562 Low Third Reading Urgency (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 562 Low Third Reading Urgency (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1635.). |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 950 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 953 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 6276.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |