CA AB561 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 7514.9 to the Government Code, and to add Section 6012.10 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to local government, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Sales and use taxes: exclusion: public safety first responder vehicle and equipment: local public employee retirement: employer contributions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Employees, Retirement, and Social Security] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Employees, Retirement, and Social Security] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 3). |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and P.E., R., & S.S. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7514.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6012.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6012.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |