CA AB559 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 171, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 32504, 32515, and 32516 of, and to repeal and add Section 32519 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to resource conservation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

San Joaquin River Conservancy: governing board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-02 - Assembly - AB 559 Arambula Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB559 Arambula By Caballero (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 559 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-16 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 171, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-16 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-10 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2021-09-02AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 15.).
2021-09-02AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 43. Noes 12.)
2021-09-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-09-01SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 7.).
2021-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
2021-08-23SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-07-12SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-08SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 8).
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2021-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 17.)
2021-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 19).
2021-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O.
2021-04-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2021-03-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2021-03-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2021-02-18AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and G.O.
2021-02-12AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
2021-02-11AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code32504Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code32515Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code32516Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code32519New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback