CA AB553 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Hearing: Apr 1 @ 3:00 pm Assembly Transportation Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 2704.096 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

High-speed rail bonds: housing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-03-13AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2019-02-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2019-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Streets and Highways Code2704.096New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback