CA AB551 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 599, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 599, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1942.5 of, to amend and renumber Section 1954.1 of, and to add Chapter 2.8 (commencing with Section 1954.600) to Title 5 of Part 4 of Division 3 of, the Civil Code, relating to tenancy.
Title
Rental property: bed bugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Assembly - AB 551 NAZARIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 65 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB551 Nazarian By Jackson (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 551 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB551 Nazarian By Jackson (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 551 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 599, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 15. Page 6349.). |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 5271.). |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Jackson. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 7). |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 11. Page 1840.) |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 12). |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1942.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1954.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1954.600 | New Code | See Bill Text |