CA AB549 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 358 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to nonminor dependents.
Title
Nonminor dependents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD. |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 358 | Amended Code | Citation Text |