CA AB549 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 559, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 5003.4, 5005, 5009.1, 5009.2, 5010.7, 5080.18, and 5080.20 of the Public Resources Code, relating to state parks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State park system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-02 - Assembly - AB 549 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB549 Levine By Pavley (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Assembly - AB 549 LEVINE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 559, Statutes of 2015.
2015-10-07 Approved by the Governor.
2015-09-14AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2015-09-02AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2795.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2803.).
2015-09-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2015-09-01SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2347.).
2015-08-31SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-27SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 27).
2015-07-13SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-07-13SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2015-06-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-06-29SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 23).
2015-06-16SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2015-05-14SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2015-05-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-05-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1263.)
2015-04-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2015-04-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 28).
2015-03-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on W., P., & W.
2015-02-24AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
2015-02-23AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_549&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20150223_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20150616_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20150630_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20150713_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20150831_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20150904_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20151007_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20150428_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20150504_0137PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20150623_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20150713_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20150827_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20150901_1204PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20150902_0123PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback