CA AB547 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 941, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 941, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 679.06 to the Penal Code, relating to victims of domestic violence and stalking.
Title
Domestic violence: victim’s rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 547 McCarty Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB547 McCarty By Rubio (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - Assembly - AB 547 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB547 McCarty By Rubio (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - Assembly - AB 547 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 941, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 1.). |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5181.). |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | From special consent calendar. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-08 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 31). |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-01-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 3308.) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member McCarty. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member McCarty. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 679.06 | New Code | See Bill Text |