CA AB547 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 715, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 715, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1420, 1425, 1429, 1429.5, 1431, and 1432 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Janitorial workers: sexual violence and harassment prevention training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 547 Gonzalez Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 6 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB547 Gonzalez et al. By Durazo (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Bill Votes (Y: 13 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 547 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB547 Gonzalez et al. By Durazo (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Bill Votes (Y: 13 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 547 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 715, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 6. Page 3507.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 2819.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 13. Page 1627.) |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 8). |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1420 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1425 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1429 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1429.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1431 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1432 | Amended Code | Citation Text |