CA AB546 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 532, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 23363.3, 25503, and 25611.1 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages: advertising and brandy tastings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-11 - Assembly - AB 546 Villapudua Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB546 Villapudua By Wilk (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 546 Villapudua Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 532, Statutes of 2023.
2023-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2023-09-15 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2023-09-11AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3188.).
2023-09-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2023-09-07SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2453.).
2023-08-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-08-28SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2023-08-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-08-14SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2023-07-13SenateOrdered to third reading.
2023-07-13SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2023-07-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2023-07-10SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2023-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2023-05-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2023-05-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1811.)
2023-05-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2023-05-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 17).
2023-03-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-03-15AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O.
2023-03-14AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
2023-02-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2023-02-09AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
2023-02-08AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback