CA AB543 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 442, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 6385 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and Use Tax Law: exemptions: petroleum products: water common carriers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB543 Gipson Glazer (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [06-21-2023]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 543 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 442, Statutes of 2023.
2023-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2023-09-18 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2023-09-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2023-09-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 5. Page 2565.).
2023-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-09-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2023-08-14SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
2023-07-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-06-21SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
2023-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2023-05-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2023-05-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1805.)
2023-05-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
2023-05-18AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.)
2023-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2023-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2023-04-24AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2023-03-14AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
2023-02-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2023-02-09AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
2023-02-08AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code6385Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback