CA AB540 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 15951, 15952, and 15975 of, and to add Sections 15950.5, 15955.5, and 15987 to, the Government Code, to add Section 99312.8 to the Public Utilities Code, and to amend Section 11052 of, and to add Sections 11052.5 and 11053.5 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to transportation, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Social Service Transportation Improvement Act: coordinated transportation services agencies.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2024-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2023-03-27AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2023-03-02AssemblyReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and REV. & TAX.
2023-02-09AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
2023-02-08AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code15950.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code15951Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code15952Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code15955.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code15975Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code15987New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code99312.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code11052Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code11052.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code11053.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback