CA AB540 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 14595 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to the elderly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Program of All-Inclusive Care for the Elderly.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 540 Petrie-Norris Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-26SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2021-07-15SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-06-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-16SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-05-20AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
2021-05-19AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-27AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 20).
2021-04-15AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-04-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-02-18AssemblyReferred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and HEALTH.
2021-02-11AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
2021-02-10AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14595New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback