CA AB54 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 793, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 14571.6, 14571.9, and 14581 of, and to add and repeal Section 14572.3 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to recycling, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The California Beverage Container Recycling and Litter Reduction Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-14 - Assembly - AB 54 Ting Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB54 Ting et al. By Skinner Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - AB 54 Ting Third Reading Urgency (Y: 65 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 793, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-12 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-26AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2019-09-14AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3609.).
2019-09-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2019-09-13SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2948.).
2019-09-12SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 12).
2019-09-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-09-10SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2019-09-10SenateSenate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2746.)
2019-09-09SenateRe-referred to Com. on EQ.
2019-09-09SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-09-09SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2019-09-09SenateJoint Rules 61 and 62 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2689.)
2019-09-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-20SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S.
2019-03-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-03-25AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 6. Page 813.).
2019-03-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-03-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 20).
2019-03-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-02-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (February 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-01-17AssemblyReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
2018-12-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
2018-12-03AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback