CA AB538 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Part 6.8 (commencing with Section 15375) of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to aerospace.
Title
California Aerospace Commission: establishment.
Sponsors
Asm. Laura Friedman [D] | Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D] | Asm. Tasha Boerner Horvath [D] | Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R] |
Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D] | Asm. Thurston Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 538 Muratsuchi Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 538 Muratsuchi Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-07-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1763.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 15375 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |