CA AB538 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 465, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 465, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 340.3 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to add Section 5065.5 to the Penal Code, relating to criminal offenders.
Title
Actions for damages: felony offenses: victim notification.
Sponsors
Asm. Nora Campos [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-01 - Assembly - AB 538 CAMPOS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB538 Campos By Moorlach (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - AB 538 CAMPOS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB538 Campos By Moorlach (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - AB 538 CAMPOS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 465, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2729.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2735.). |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2298.). |
2015-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). |
2015-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1636.) |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 340.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 5065.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |