CA AB535 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 466, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 112895 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to food labeling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Olive oil: labeling.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-01 - Assembly - AB 535 Aguiar-Curry Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB535 Aguiar-Curry et al. By Hurtado (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - AB 535 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-04 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 466, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-04 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-08 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2021-09-01AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 0.).
2021-09-01AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 16.)
2021-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.).
2021-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2021-07-15SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-14SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 14).
2021-07-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-06-28SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2021-06-17SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-06-09SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2021-05-27SenateReferred to Coms. on AGRI. and HEALTH.
2021-05-18SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 7.)
2021-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-04-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 21).
2021-04-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-13AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-03-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2021-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2021-03-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
2021-02-18AssemblyReferred to Coms. on AGRI. and HEALTH.
2021-02-11AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
2021-02-10AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code112895Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB535
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB535#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB535#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB535#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB535#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB535#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB535#94ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB535#93CHP
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB535

Bill Comments

feedback