CA AB534 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 10001.5 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to food access.
Title
Social services: access to food.
Sponsors
Asm. Chad Mayes [I] | Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] | Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D] | Sen. Ling Ling Chang [R] |
Asm. Phillip Chen [R] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Assembly - 04/09/19 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Agriculture] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Agriculture] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and AGRI. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10001.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |