CA AB531 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 789, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 789, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 50675.1.5 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 5960.31 to, to add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 5965) to Part 7 of Division 5 of, and to repeal Section 5960.45 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to behavioral health, by providing the funds necessary therefor through an election for the issuance and sale of bonds of the State of California and for the handling and disposition of those funds.
Title
The Behavioral Health Infrastructure Bond Act of 2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Assembly - AB 531 Irwin Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB531 Irwin et al. By Eggman (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-14 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-28 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 531 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB531 Irwin et al. By Eggman (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-14 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-28 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 531 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 789, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 8. Page 3608.). |
2023-09-14 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (September 14). |
2023-09-14 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3587.) |
2023-09-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2023-09-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 2779.). |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Joint Rule 61(a)(13) suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 2607.) |
2023-09-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2023-08-28 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2023-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2023-06-19 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and M. & V.A. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1918.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and M. & V.A. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2023-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 50675.1.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5960.31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5960.45 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |