CA AB529 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 500, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 500, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 7235 and 7236 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to amend Section 34622 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 34501.12, 34505.5, 34505.6, 34515, 34601, 34623, and 40000.22 of, and to repeal Section 34606 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: motor carriers: inspections and fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Assembly - AB 529 LOWENTHAL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB529 Lowenthal By Gaines (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Assembly - AB 529 LOWENTHAL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB529 Lowenthal By Gaines (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Assembly - AB 529 LOWENTHAL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 500, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2013-09-18 | Assembly | Enrolled measure version corrected. |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 2. Page 3102.). |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2252.). |
2013-09-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 1567.) |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7235 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7236 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 34501.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 34505.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 34505.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 34515 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 34601 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 34606 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 34622 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 34623 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 40000.22 | New Code | See Bill Text |