CA AB527 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 404, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 404, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11901, 11902, 11905, and 11910 of, and to add Section 11902.5 to, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to pest control operations.
Title
Pest control aircraft pilot’s certificate: unmanned aircraft.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Assembly - AB 527 Caballero Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB527 Caballero By Wieckowski (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Agriculture] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 527 CABALLERO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB527 Caballero By Wieckowski (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Agriculture] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 527 CABALLERO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 404, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 3395.). |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 2. Page 2857.). |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-08-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-28 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and AGRI. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 1526.) |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 3). |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 18). |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and P. & C.P. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 11901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 11902 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 11902.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 11905 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 11910 | Amended Code | Citation Text |