CA AB522 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 491, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 491, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4584 of the Public Resources Code, relating to forestry.
Title
Forestry: Forest Fire Prevention Exemption.
Sponsors
Asm. Vince Fong [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB522 Fong By Caballero (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Assembly - AB 522 Fong Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Assembly - AB 522 Fong Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 491, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-29 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 2. Page 4944.). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 4. Page 3401.) |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (January 20). |
2022-01-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 10). |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 4584 | Amended Code | Citation Text |