CA AB520 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-16 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-16 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 17 (commencing with Section 44419) of Chapter 2 of Part 25 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to teacher development.
Title
Teacher retention: California Diversifying the Teacher Workforce Grant Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 520 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 520 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1633.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 7). |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44419 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |