CA AB515 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-07 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-07 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 602 of the Penal Code, relating to trespass.
Title
Trespass.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-08 - Assembly - AB 515 Chen Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB515 Chen By Ochoa Bogh (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - AB 515 Chen Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB515 Chen By Ochoa Bogh (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - AB 515 Chen Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2021-10-04 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2021-09-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2903.). |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 2875.) |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2464.). |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1067.) |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14). |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 23). |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |