CA AB512 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 841, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 21400 of the Government Code, relating to public employees’ retirement, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public employees’ retirement: safety members: industrial disability retirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-14 - Assembly - AB 512 Rodriguez Special Consent Calendar 1st Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB512 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 512 RODRIGUEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 841, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-15 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-25AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
2017-09-14AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3423.).
2017-09-14AssemblyOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-09-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2017-09-14SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2911.).
2017-09-12SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-09-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-08SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2017-07-10SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2017-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1819.)
2017-05-26AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
2017-04-26AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-03-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-02-27AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
2017-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2017-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code21400Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback