CA AB510 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 6, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 6, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2827 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Net energy metering.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-18 - Assembly - AB 510 SKINNER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB510 Skinner By Kehoe (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-07-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-01 - Assembly - AB 510 EVANS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB510 Skinner By Kehoe (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-07-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-01 - Assembly - AB 510 EVANS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 6, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-02-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-02-19 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:15 p.m. | |
2010-02-18 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 61. Noes 4. Page 4072.) | |
2010-02-11 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after February 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-02-11 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 5. Page 2797.) | |
2010-02-08 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-02-04 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. | |
2010-01-27 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-01-26 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-08-27 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2009-07-13 | In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file. | |
2009-06-24 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 23). | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |
2009-06-02 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-01 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 1870.) | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-29 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 14). | |
2009-04-13 | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2009-04-02 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-12 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2009-02-25 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2009-02-24 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2827 | Amended Code | Citation Text |