CA AB509 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 42885, 42889, and 42961.5 of, to add Section 42872.2, and to repeal and add Section 42872.1 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to tire recycling.
Title
Tire recycling: California tire regulatory fee and waste tire program.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Frazier [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 509 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 30 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 509 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 30 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 30. Page 2001.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 26). |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 17). |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42872.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42872.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42885 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42889 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42961.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |