CA AB508 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 123237 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health: maternal health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-01-27 - Assembly - AB 508 GARCIA, C. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30SenateFrom Senate committee without further action.
2016-06-21SenateRe-referred to Coms. on JUD. and HEALTH.
2016-06-20SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2016-02-04SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2016-01-27SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2016-01-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3504.)
2016-01-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-01-21AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2016-01-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-01-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2016-01-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2016-01-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2015-04-21AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-03-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2015-02-24AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
2015-02-23AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code123237New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code137.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_508&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_508_bill_20150223_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_508_bill_20160104_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_508_bill_20160113_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_508_bill_20160121_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_508_bill_20160620_amended_sen_v95.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_508_vote_20160112_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_508_vote_20160121_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_508_vote_20160127_1246PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback