CA AB506 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1423, 1424, and 1424.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities.
Title
Long-term health facilities.
Sponsors
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 506 Kalra Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB506 Kalra By Pan (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 506 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB506 Kalra By Pan (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 506 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2019-10-12 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2019-09-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 3507.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2806.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 2. Page 1618.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 2). |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1423 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1424 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1424.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |