CA AB502 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 516, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 516, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1925 of, and to add Article 9.1 (commencing with Section 1967) to Chapter 4 of Division 2 of, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 13401 and 13401.5 of the Corporations Code, relating to dental hygiene.
Title
Dental hygiene.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Assembly - AB 502 CHAU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB502 Chau By Hill (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Assembly - AB 502 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB502 Chau By Hill (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Assembly - AB 502 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 516, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3140.). |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2713.). |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-20 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1907.) |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1761.) |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 13). |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 7.) (April 28). |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 14). |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 1924 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1925 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1926 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1931 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1967 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Corporations Code | 13401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 13401.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1374.196 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10120.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |