CA AB50 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 14132.265 and 14132.267 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: Assisted Living Waiver program.
Sponsors
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 50 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 50 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2017.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.265 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.267 | New Code | See Bill Text |