CA AB499 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 155, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 11019.7 of the Government Code, relating to state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal information: social security numbers: state agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 499 Mayes Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Special Consent AB499 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 499 Mayes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-25 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 155, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-25 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-08AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2020-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5311.).
2020-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-28SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4383.).
2020-08-26SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2020-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-08-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20).
2020-08-19SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-08-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-31SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2020-07-08SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2020-01-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-01-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3891.)
2020-01-23AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-01-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23).
2020-01-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-01-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-01-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2020-01-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-01-06AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 6). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on INS.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
2019-02-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2019-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2019-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code11019.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback