CA AB499 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 652, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 6926 of the Family Code, relating to minors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minors: medical care: consent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB499 Atkins By Evans (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 499 ATKINS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-10-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 652, Statutes of 2011.
2011-10-09 Approved by the Governor.
2011-09-07 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2011-09-01 In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2011-08-31 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 17. Page 2204.).
2011-08-29 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-08-25 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25).
2011-08-15 In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2011-07-06 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-06-15 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-06-14 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 14).
2011-05-26 Referred to Com. on JUD.
2011-05-12 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2011-05-12 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 1338.)
2011-04-27 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-04-26 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 26).
2011-04-12 In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2011-04-06 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2011-03-07 Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
2011-02-16 From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2011-02-15 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Code6926Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_499&sess=1112&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_499_bill_20110215_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_499_bill_20110902_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_499_bill_20111009_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_499_vote_20110405_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_499_vote_20110426_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_499_vote_20110512_1011AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_499_vote_20110614_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_499_vote_20110815_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_499_vote_20110825_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_499_vote_20110831_0443PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback