CA AB496 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 11 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 23.8, 23.9, 25, 27, 28, 30, 31, 101, 101.7, 102.3, 103, 105.5, 106, 107, 108.5, 111, 114, 114.3, 115.5, 115.6, 116, 119, 120, 121, 124, 125, 125.3, 125.6, 125.9, 127, 129, 130, 132, 136, 137, 138, 144, 151, 152, 152.6, 153, 156.1, 158, 159.5, 161, 210, 328, 450, and 450.3 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to business and professions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business and professions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 496 Low Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB496 Low By Glazer (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 496 Low Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.).
2019-09-11AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended.
2019-09-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-10SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-06-13SenateOrdered to third reading.
2019-06-13SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2019-06-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-06-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10).
2019-05-22SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-05-14SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-13AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1615.)
2019-05-06AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1502.)
2019-04-04AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-04-04AssemblyFrom Consent Calendar.
2019-04-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-04-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 2).
2019-02-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2019-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code101Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code101.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code102.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code103Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code105.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code106Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code107Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code108.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code111Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code114Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code114.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code115.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code115.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code116Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code119Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code120Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code121Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code124Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code125Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code125.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code125.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code125.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code127Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code129Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code130Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code132Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code136Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code137Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code138Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code144Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code151Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code152Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code152.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code153Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code156.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code158Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code159.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code161Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code210Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code23.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code23.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code27Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code28Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code30Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code31Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code328Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code450Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code450.3Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback