CA AB494 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 90, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 90, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 18901.15 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
CalFresh: eligibility: shelter expense deductions.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Berman [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB494 Berman Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - AB 494 Berman Third Reading Urgency (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - AB 494 Berman Third Reading Urgency (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 90, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1877.). |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1258.). |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18901.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |