CA AB493 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-08 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-08 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10112.27, 10198.7, 10753.05, 10753.14, 10965.3, and 10965.9 of the Insurance Code, relating to health insurance.
Title
Health insurance.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] | Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Assembly - AB 493 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 2. Page 929.) |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (March 23). |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 10112.27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10198.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10753.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10753.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10965.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10965.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |