CA AB491 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 292, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 292, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 13000, 13015, 13020, 13025, and 13030 of the Education Code, relating to education.
Title
California Civil Liberties Public Education Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 491 MURATSUCHI Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB491 Muratsuchi By Pan (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 491 MURATSUCHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB491 Muratsuchi By Pan (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 491 MURATSUCHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 292, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 11. Page 3286.). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3254.) |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 2685.). |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1894.) |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22). |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 13000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 13015 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 13020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 13025 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 13030 | Amended Code | Citation Text |