CA AB484 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 373, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 373, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7599.44 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Alarm company operators: advertisements.
Sponsors
Asm. Jose Medina [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB484 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 484 Medina Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 484 Medina Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 373, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2237.). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1335.) |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7599.44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |