CA AB479 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 86, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1203.099 of the Penal Code, relating to domestic violence, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alternative domestic violence program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB479 Blanca Rubio Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Assembly - AB 479 Blanca Rubio Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-21 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 86, Statutes of 2023.
2023-07-21 Approved by the Governor.
2023-07-11 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2023-06-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2023-06-29SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1827.).
2023-06-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2023-06-26SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2023-06-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-05-10SenateReferred to Com. on PUB S.
2023-04-27SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2023-04-27AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1363.).
2023-04-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2023-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 19).
2023-03-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-03-15AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2023-03-14AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 14).
2023-02-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2023-02-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
2023-02-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1203.099Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback