CA AB476 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 11 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 7.).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 110.5 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Consumer Affairs: task force: foreign-trained professionals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 476 Blanca Rubio Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB476 Blanca Rubio By Pan (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 476 Blanca Rubio Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 7.).
2019-09-11AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended.
2019-09-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-10SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 30).
2019-07-01SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-05-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 10. Page 1806.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 3.) (May 16).
2019-04-03AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 3.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-02-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2019-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code110.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback