CA AB474 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 63089.1, 63089.4, 63089.5, and 63089.98 of, to add Sections 63089.642 and 63089.644 to, and to add Article 12 (commencing with Section 63090) and Article 13 (commencing with Section 63095) to, Chapter 6 of Division 1 of Title 6.7 of, the Government Code, relating to the Capital Access Loan Program, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Capital Access Loan Program for Small Businesses.
Sponsors
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D] | Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Asm. Luz Rivas [D] | Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D] |
Asm. Christy Smith [D] | Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 63089.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 63089.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 63089.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 63089.642 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 63089.644 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 63089.98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |