CA AB471 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 372, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 372, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 9884, 9884.7, 9884.16, and 9884.22 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 9882 and 9889.21 of, to add Sections 9887.5, 9888.4.1, and 9889.19.1 to, to add Article 6.5 (commencing with Section 9888.5) to Chapter 20.3 of Division 3 of, and to repeal Article 5 (commencing with Section 9887.1), Article 6 (commencing with Section 9888.1), and Article 8 (commencing with Section 9889.15) of Chapter 20.3 of Division 3 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to automotive repair.
Title
Bureau of Automotive Repair: administration: citations: safety inspections.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Heath Flora [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-10 - Assembly - AB 471 Low Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB471 Low et al. By Min (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 471 Low Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB471 Low et al. By Min (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 471 Low Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 372, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3150.). |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2606.). |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 13). |
2021-07-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 1762.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 9882 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9884 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9884.16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9884.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9884.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9889.21 | New Code | See Bill Text |