CA AB470 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 14005.11, 14005.20, 14005.40, 14005.401, 14006.3, 14006.4, 14006.5, 14007.9, 14009.6, 14009.7, 14011, 14013.3, 14051, 14051.5, and 14148.5 of, to add Section 14005.62 to, and to repeal Sections 14006, 14006.01, 14006.1, 14006.15, 14006.2, 14006.6, and 14015 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medi-Cal: eligibility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-28AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
2021-04-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-13AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 6).
2021-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-03-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-02-09AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
2021-02-08AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14005.11Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14005.20Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14005.40Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14005.401Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14005.62New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14006Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14006.01Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14006.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14006.15Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14006.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14006.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14006.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14006.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14006.6Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14007.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14009.6Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14009.7Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14011Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14013.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14015Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14051Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14051.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14148.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback