CA AB470 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 112, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 112, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 791.13 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance information.
Title
Insurance information: confidentiality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB470 Niello (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-23 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 470 NIELLO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-06-23 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 470 NIELLO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 112, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-08-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-07-30 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2009-06-29 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-06-29 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1518.) | |
2009-06-25 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-06-24 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 23). | |
2009-06-18 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 17). | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to Coms. on B., F. & I. and JUD. | |
2009-05-14 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-14 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1466.) | |
2009-05-07 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-06 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 6). | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |
2009-02-25 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2009-02-24 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 791.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |