CA AB469 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 839, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 839, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8106 of the Elections Code, relating to elections, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Candidates: nomination documents.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Cooper [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Assembly - AB 469 COOPER Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 60 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB469 Cooper By Allen Urgency Clause (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - AB 469 COOPER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB469 Cooper By Allen Urgency Clause (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - AB 469 COOPER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 839, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 11. Page 3171.). |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 2572.). |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 20). |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 8. Page 1658.) |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 8061 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 8106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |