CA AB469 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-03 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-03 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17511.1 and 17511.4 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to advertising.
Title
Telephonic sellers: loan modifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Banking and Financial Institution (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 469 WAGNER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 469 WAGNER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F.I. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and B. & F.I. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1477.) |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2013-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 17511.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 17511.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |